+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2022-81
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Appropriations
- Withdrawn from Appropriations
- Received
- Substituted for SB 940
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported out of Commerce Committee
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill released to House Calendar
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable by Commerce Committee
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Commerce Committee agenda
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
- Original reference removed: State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- CS Filed
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- PCS added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On November 5, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
- Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
On October 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 471.055 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2022: Floor vote: H 375 c1
- Yeas: 112
March 4, 2022: Floor vote: H 375 c1
- Yeas: 38
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor