+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- See SB 2500 (line item 2198A)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor