+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2015-172
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Concurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (922237)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
- Concurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (163134)
- Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (922237)
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted for CS/SB 534
- Withdrawn from Transportation; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- In returning messages
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (163134)
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/19/15, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/16/15, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- CS referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Transportation and Ports Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
- CS by Transportation and Ports Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Transportation and Ports Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Ports Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (6)
922237 - Amendment to Amendment (163134)
Remove lines 13-50 of the amendment and insert:
163134 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
758890 - Amendment to Amendment (643094)
Delete lines 14 - 35 and insert:
643094 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
393083 - Amendment
Remove line 19 and insert:
729657 - Amendment
Remove lines 25-50 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2015: Floor vote: H 0369 c2
- Yeas: 40
April 24, 2015: Floor vote: H 0369 c2
- Yeas: 113
April 22, 2015: Floor vote: H 0369 c2
- Yeas: 36
April 9, 2015: Floor vote: H 0369 c2
- Yeas: 113
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor