+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2018-47
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 1004
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Rules
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Rules
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/15/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On October 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
437431 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 985.6885 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2018: Floor vote: H 361 c1
- Yeas: 37
March 1, 2018: Floor vote: H 361 c1
- Yeas: 113
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor