+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Education
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/28/19, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
- CS referred to Education Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
- CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 11, 2019: Floor vote: H 349 c1
- Yeas: 115
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor