+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2018 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 372)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On January 5, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On November 22, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor