+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On November 24, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
- Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
On November 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor