+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 495 (Ch. 2018-150), CS/CS/HB 731 (Ch. 2018-134), CS/CS/CS/HB 1279 (Ch. 2018-5)
- Substituted CS/SB 88 (Died in House returning Messages)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
On February 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 2
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/21/18, 10:00 am, Reed Hall
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On October 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Education Committee
On October 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- 1003.41 - Next Generation Sunshine State Standards.
- 1003.4282 - Requirements for a standard high school diploma.
- 11.45 - Definitions; duties; authorities; reports; rules.
- 121.091 - Benefits payable under the system.
- 1001.20 - Department under direction of state board.
- 1001.39 - District school board members; travel expenses.
- 1001.395 - District school board members; compensation.
- 1001.42 - Powers and duties of district school board.
- 1002.395 - Florida Tax Credit Scholarship Program.
- 1007.35 - Florida Partnership for Minority and Underrepresented Student Achievement.
- 1010.20 - Cost accounting and reporting for school districts.
- 1011.01 - Budget system established.
- 1011.03 - Public hearings; budget to be submitted to Department of Education.
- 1011.035 - School district budget transparency.
- 1011.051 - Guidelines for general funds.
- 1011.06 - Expenditures.
- 1011.09 - Expenditure of funds by district school board.
- 1011.10 - Penalty.
- 1011.60 - Minimum requirements of the Florida Education Finance Program.
- 1011.64 - School district minimum classroom expenditure requirements.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor