+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2018 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 1282A)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On November 20, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor