+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1502)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- See SB 2500 (line item 1502)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
- Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor