+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/11/19, 11:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor