+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- See SB 2500 (line item 2224M)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor