+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2018 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On January 5, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On November 20, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor