+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
- Immediately certified
- CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reported out of State Affairs Committee
- Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
- Now in State Affairs Committee
- Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
- CS Filed
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
- Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
517989 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/18/2021)
Remove lines 43-86 and insert:
565777 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/17/2021)
Remove lines 79-84 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 15, 2021: Floor vote: H 313 c2
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor