+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Health Policy
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/18/18, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On January 5, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On December 11, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
On December 8, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 8:30 am, Mashburn Hall
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On October 12, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
459689 - Amendment
Remove lines 123-354 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 456.013 - Department; general licensing provisions.
- 458.310 - Restricted licenses.
- 458.3105 -
- 458.311 - Licensure by examination; requirements; fees.
- 458.319 - Renewal of license.
- 459.00751 -
- 459.00752 -
- 459.008 - Renewal of licenses and certificates.
- 766.1115 - Health care providers; creation of agency relationship with governmental contractors.
+ − Vote
January 31, 2018: Floor vote: H 313 c1
- Yeas: 114
+ − Sponsors (2)
Grant, M.
Type:
Primary Sponsor