+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor