+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2017-55, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
- Approved by Governor
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Substituted for CS/SB 360
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Education; Appropriations
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (8)
477766 - Amendment
Delete lines 96 - 188.
468430 - Amendment
Between lines 192 and 193 insert:
108844 - Amendment
Between lines 88 and 89 insert:
007929 - Amendment
Remove lines 59-70 and insert:
462837 - Amendment
Between lines 80 and 81, insert:
457461 - Amendment
Remove line 72 and insert:
193013 - Amendment
Remove line 46 and insert:
265377 - Amendment
Between lines 78 and 79, insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 1003.4156 - General requirements for middle grades promotion.
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2017: Floor vote: H 293 c2
- Yeas: 37
April 20, 2017: Floor vote: H 293 c2
- Yeas: 119