+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 3165A)
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On November 23, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
- Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
On November 15, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor