+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor