+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2018-45
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 522
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (791755)
- Passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/18/18, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On January 5, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/09/18, 4:30 pm, Webster Hall
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
On October 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
791755 - Amendment
Remove line 64 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 39.6021 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2018: Floor vote: H 281 e1
- Yeas: 36
January 31, 2018: Floor vote: H 281
- Yeas: 112