+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On December 9, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/09/19, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor