+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 1524)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On December 9, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/09/19, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor