+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 100, NAYS 17
- Read 3rd time
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Judiciary Committee
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- CS Filed
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
554237 - Amendment (Adopted 3/9/2021)
Remove lines 32-44 and insert:
173567 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/24/2021)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
April 14, 2021: Floor vote: H 279 c2
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 17