+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 319A)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 12, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor