+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2018 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On November 15, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Cortes, B.
Type:
Primary Sponsor