+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 404 (Ch. 2020-147), CS/CS/SB 406 (Ch. 2020-148)
- Substituted CS/CS/SB 404
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6
On October 15, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 10/22/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
On October 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On October 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (6)
228393 - Amendment (House: Withdrawn 2/19/2020)
Remove lines 79-111 and insert:
443177 - Amendment (House: Withdrawn 2/19/2020)
Remove line 185 and insert:
505587 - Amendment to Amendment (443177) (House: Withdrawn 2/19/2020)
Remove line 6 of the amendment and insert:
175049 - Amendment to Amendment (443177) (House: Withdrawn 2/19/2020)
Remove line 6 of the amendment and insert:
156871 - Amendment to Amendment (443177) (House: Withdrawn 2/19/2020)
Remove line 6 of the amendment and insert:
195137 - Substitute Amendment (443177) (House: Withdrawn 2/19/2020)
Remove line 185 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor