+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Substituted SB 352
- Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 352 (Ch. 2022-120)
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Judiciary Committee
- Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
- Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
On November 23, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
On October 22, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
On October 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
232933 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 1/13/2022)
Remove line 49 and insert:
476377 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 1/20/2022)
Remove line 17 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 713.135 - Notice of commencement and applicability of lien.