+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1668B)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 1668B)
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On November 9, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
- Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
On November 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor