+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 2424A)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 2424A)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 12, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On December 5, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall -- Meeting Cancelled
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On November 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor