+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- See SB 2500 (line item 1606A)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/22/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall --Meeting cancelled
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor