+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
- Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor