+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 3153A)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 3153A)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 9:30 am, Reed Hall
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor