+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Criminal Justice
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy
- In Messages
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 4
- Read 3rd time
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/02/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/30/15, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/19/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/11/15, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
138295 - Amendment
Remove lines 93-94 and insert:
116989 - Amendment
Remove lines 86-93 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
April 22, 2015: Floor vote: H 0235 c2
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 4