+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 1196)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 20, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On December 12, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On December 5, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor