+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 376)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 376)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor