+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- See SB 2500 (line item 2371A)
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
- Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor