+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2015-138
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for SB 590
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy
- In Messages
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 2
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/15
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/19/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 02/09/15, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 256.041 -
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2015: Floor vote: H 0225
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
March 27, 2015: Floor vote: H 0225
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Cortes, B.
Type:
Primary Sponsor