+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/23/17, 9:30 am, Reed Hall
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed