+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- See SB 2500 (line item 124A)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor