+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 8:00 am, 116 Knott Building
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor