+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2017-50
- Approved by Governor
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Health Policy; Education; Rules
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 496
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Health Policy; Education; Rules
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (348969)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/16/17, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/15/17, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (5)
348969 - Amendment
Remove lines 212-215 and insert:
200947 - Amendment
Remove line 50 and insert:
632617 - Strike All Amendment
Between lines 118 and 119, insert:
625697 - Amendment
Between lines 14 and 15, insert:
315445 - Amendment
Remove lines 95-102 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 458.3145 - Medical faculty certificate.
- 456.013 - Department; general licensing provisions.
- 458.3137 - Temporary certificate for visiting physicians to obtain medical privileges for instructional purposes in conjunction with certain plastic surgery or other medical or surgical training programs and educational symposiums.
- 458.3485 - Medical assistant.
- 483.291 - Powers and duties of the agency; rules.
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2017: Floor vote: H 209 e1
- Yeas: 37
April 5, 2017: Floor vote: H 209 e1
- Yeas: 116