+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2018 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 313A)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On October 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor