+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On October 16, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 10/23/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On September 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On September 9, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor