+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2020-65
On June 20, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 604
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/22/20
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/16/20, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
On December 12, 2019 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
On November 8, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On October 31, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 11/07/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
867457 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 12/11/2019)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2020: Floor vote: H 197 c1
- Yeas: 40
January 22, 2020: Floor vote: H 197 c1
- Yeas: 118
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor