+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2019-99
- Approved by Governor
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 93 NAYS 20
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (339068)
- In returning messages
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 13
- Read 3rd time
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1528
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (339068)
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 93 NAYS 22
- Read 3rd time
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 8
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/18/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (16)
339068 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
539774 - Amendment to Amendment (368506)
Delete line 278 and insert:
502814 - Amendment to Amendment (368506)
Delete line 1074 and insert:
738486 - Amendment to Amendment (368506)
Delete lines 316 - 365 and insert:
368506 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
283251 - Amendment
Between lines 947 and 948, insert:
098515 - Amendment
Between lines 947 and 948, insert:
034319 - Amendment
Remove line 101 and insert:
337451 - Amendment
Between lines 278 and 279, insert:
195555 - Amendment
Remove line 954 and insert:
165395 - Amendment
Remove lines 159-176 and insert:
000075 - Amendment
Between lines 176 and 177, insert:
776563 - Amendment
Remove lines 197-201 and insert:
567427 - Amendment
Remove lines 217-230 and insert:
564655 - Amendment
Remove line 395 and insert:
971401 - Amendment
Between lines 959 and 960, insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 381.02035 -
- 465.0157 -
- 465.017 - Authority to inspect; disposal.
- 499.005 - Prohibited acts.
- 499.0051 - Criminal acts.
- 499.01 - Permits.
- 499.012 - Permit application requirements.
- 499.015 - Registration of drugs and devices; issuance of certificates of free sale.
- 499.0285 -
- 499.065 - Inspections; imminent danger.
+ − Votes (3)
April 29, 2019: Floor vote: H 19 c1
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 20
April 29, 2019: Floor vote: H 19 c1
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 13
April 11, 2019: Floor vote: H 19 c1
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 22