+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 102 (Ch. 2014-225)
- Substituted CS/CS/SB 102
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/14
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Reed Hall
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/19/14, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 02/18/14, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On November 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
On October 16, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 316.027 - Crash involving death or personal injuries.
- 322.28 - Period of suspension or revocation.
- 322.34 - Driving while license suspended, revoked, canceled, or disqualified.
- 921.0022 - Criminal Punishment Code; offense severity ranking chart.
- 322.0261 - Driver improvement course; requirement to maintain driving privileges; failure to complete; department approval of course.
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor