+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 312 (Ch. 2022-26)
- Substituted SB 312
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill released to House Calendar
- Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
- Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Health & Human Services Committee
- Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
- Favorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
- Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
On September 17, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
- Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
- Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
On August 2, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 456.47 - Use of telehealth to provide services.