+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Commerce Committee
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 6
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 1:15 pm, Webster Hall
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (3)
383805 - Amendment to Amendment (081413)
Remove line 17 of the amendment and insert:
880037 - Amendment to Amendment (081413)
Remove lines 27-29 of the amendment and insert:
081413 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 163.20 -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor