+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall --Temporarily Postponed
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 7, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On September 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On September 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
079357 - Amendment
Between lines 45 and 46, insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 787.0611 -