+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2021-62
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Withdrawn from Rules
- Substituted for SB 952
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
- Ordered enrolled
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Rules
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill released to House Calendar
- Reported out of State Affairs Committee
- Favorable by State Affairs Committee
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
- Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
- Now in State Affairs Committee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
- Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
- Favorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Environment, Agriculture and Flooding Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 373.6075 -
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2021: Floor vote: H 169 Filed
- Yeas: 40
April 21, 2021: Floor vote: H 169 Filed
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor